VA SB25 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0001)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0001)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Brownfield and Coal Mine Renewable Energy Grant Fund and Program; allocation of funds. Removes the prohibition on the allocation of funds to the Virginia Brownfield and Coal Mine Renewable Energy Grant Fund and Program unless federal funds are available in an amount that would cover the entire cost of such an allocation.
Title
Virginia Brownfield and Coal Mine Renewable Energy Grant Fund and Program; allocation of funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (93-Y 6-N) (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0001) | |
2024-03-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 1, 2024 |
2024-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB25ER) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-19 | House | VOTE: Passage (93-Y 6-N) |
2024-02-19 | House | Passed House (93-Y 6-N) |
2024-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-14 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103761D |
Same As/Similar To
HB199 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0100)