VA SB255 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Thomas Nelson Community College; pilot program for high school seniors. Requires Thomas Nelson Community College to create a pilot program to allow certain high school seniors to enroll in Thomas Nelson Community College full-time. Tuition and fees would be paid as follows: one-third by the student, one-third by the local school division the student had attended immediately preceding the program, and one-third by the Commonwealth; however, tuition for any science, technology, engineering, and mathematics (STEM) course would be waived. In order to be eligible for this program, a student would need to have earned all credits required for a standard or advanced high school diploma by the end of the first semester of his senior year of high school. The provisions of this act will not become effective unless funded by the General Assembly during the 2012 Session.
Title
Thoms Nelson Community College; creates pilot program for certain high school seniors.
Sponsors
Sen. John Miller [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-10 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2012-03-05 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-02-17 | House: Assigned App. sub: Higher Education | |
2012-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 12104777D-ES1 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB255ES1 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12104777D-S1 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12104777D-S1 | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Higher Education | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101751D |