VA SB260 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Enacted, Chapter 782 (effective 7/1/24)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Enacted, Chapter 782 (effective 7/1/24)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; Virginia preference. Provides first preference for goods produced in Virginia and then provides for preference to goods produced in the United States before a tie bid is decided by lot in determining the award for any contract for goods, services, or construction under the Virginia Public Procurement Act. Virginia Public Procurement Act; Virginia preference. Provides first preference for goods produced in Virginia and then provides for preference to goods produced in the United States before a tie bid is decided by lot in determining the award for any contract for goods, services, or construction under the Virginia Public Procurement Act.
Title
Va. Public Procurement Act; preference for goods produced in Virginia, U.S., & Va. resident bidders.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill DeSteph [R] | Sen. Christie New Craig [R] | Sen. Jeremy McPike [D] | Sen. Schuyler VanValkenburg [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - House: VOTE: (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate receded from its objection to House substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate receded from its objection to House substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | Enacted, Chapter 782 (effective 7/1/24) |
2024-04-17 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB260ER2) |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2024-04-17 | House | BLOCK VOTE: (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-04-17 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 1-N) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Governor's substitute printed 24109241D-S3 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB260ER) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Title replaced 24107970D-H1 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate receded from its objection to House substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2024-03-01 | House | House requested conference committee |
2024-03-01 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2024-02-29 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) |
2024-02-27 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-27 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-27 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB260H1 |
2024-02-27 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24107970D-H1 |
2024-02-27 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-26 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-22 | House | Committee substitute printed 24107970D-H1 |
2024-02-22 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-19 | House | Assigned GL sub: Procurement/Open Government |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB260S2 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24107632D-S2 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 24105244D-S1 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24107632D-S2 |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24105244D-S1 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102218D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1361 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 749 (effective 7/1/24)