VA SB262 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0387)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0387)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; City of Virginia Beach; board of equalization. Amends the charter for the City of Virginia Beach by expanding the board of equalization from four members to five members and an alternate.
Title
Virginia Beach, City of; amending charter, expansion of board of equalization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0387) | |
2024-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 387 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB262ER) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-28 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-23 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-19 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101465D |
Same As/Similar To
HB236 (Similar To) 2024-02-13 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
HB415 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0386)
HB415 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0386)