VA SB264 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Left in Communications, Technology and Innovation
Pending: House Communications, Technology and Innovation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Left in Communications, Technology and Innovation
Pending: House Communications, Technology and Innovation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Education; school boards; student online activity; data collection, monitoring, and restrictions. Requires the Department of Education to establish reporting expectations for school divisions that collect student online activity data and provides that if no school within a school division does so, the school board, upon submission of written documentation to the Department stating that no school within the school division collects student online activity data, shall be deemed to have satisfied such reporting expectations. The reporting expectations include: (i) making certain disclosures to parents, including what online activity is being tracked, monitored, and collected when using school devices on school property and what types of student online activity or online activity data would create an alert; (ii) including in the school division's acceptable use policy for the Internet that student online activity is being tracked and data collected; (iii) providing, to the extent available for the school division, parents the ability to access any collected student online activity data; (iv) notifying the parent of a student for whom an alert is created or an action taken on such student's online activity or associated data before the student is notified, except as provided in the bill; (v) prohibiting the inclusion of student online activity data in a student's permanent record except in the most severe cases, as defined, set forth, and made publicly available by the Department. The bill requires the Department to create and distribute to each school board (a) a template for making the required parental disclosures and (b) best practices for deleting student online activity data. Department of Education; school boards; student online activity; data collection, monitoring, and restrictions. Requires the Department of Education to establish reporting expectations for school divisions that collect student online activity data and provides that if no school within a school division does so, the school board, upon submission of written documentation to the Department stating that no school within the school division collects student online activity data, shall be deemed to have satisfied such reporting expectations. The reporting expectations include: (i) making certain disclosures to parents, including what online activity is being tracked, monitored, and collected when using school devices on school property and what types of student online activity or online activity data would create an alert; (ii) including in the school division's acceptable use policy for the Internet that student online activity is being tracked and data collected; (iii) providing, to the extent available for the school division, parents the ability to access any collected student online activity data; (iv) notifying the parent of a student for whom an alert is created or an action taken on such student's online activity or associated data before the student is notified, except as provided in the bill; (v) prohibiting the inclusion of student online activity data in a student's permanent record except in the most severe cases, as defined, set forth, and made publicly available by the Department. The bill requires the Department to create and distribute to each school board (a) a template for making the required parental disclosures and (b) best practices for deleting student online activity data.
Title
Student online activity data; definition, data collection, monitoring and restrictions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | House | Left in Communications, Technology and Innovation |
2024-02-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) |
2024-02-16 | House | Assigned CT & I sub: Technology and Innovation |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB264S1 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24106244D-S1 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24106244D-S1 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104680D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1094 (Similar To) 2024-02-13 - Left in Communications, Technology and Innovation