VA SB276 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0249)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0249)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Dam safety. Requires that the Virginia Soil and Water Conservation Board's Impounding Structure Regulations not require any dam in existence or under construction prior to July 1, 2010, that is classified as a high hazard, or is subsequently reclassified as a high hazard dam, to upgrade its spillway to pass a rainfall event that is greater than the maximum rainfall event recorded in Virginia. In addition, a dam would be in compliance with the spillway requirement of the regulations if the dam passes two-thirds of the maximum rainfall event and the dam's owner annually certifies that the dam meets certain specific conditions.
Title
Dam safety; requirements of Soil and Water Conservation Board's Impounding Structure Regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-09 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE EMERGENCY (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 99 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE EMERGENCY (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 99 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0249) | |
2010-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 249 (effective 4/8/10) | |
2010-03-15 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-14 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB276ER) | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-09 | Senate: Title replaced 10105778D-H1 | |
2010-03-09 | Senate: House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE EMERGENCY (97-Y 2-N) | |
2010-03-05 | House: Passed House with substitute with amendment (97-Y 2-N) | |
2010-03-05 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB276H1 | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Emergency clause added | |
2010-03-05 | House: Amendment by Delegate Scott, E.T. agreed to | |
2010-03-05 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10105778D-H1 | |
2010-03-05 | House: Read third time | |
2010-03-05 | House: Passed by motion rejected | |
2010-03-04 | House: Read second time | |
2010-03-03 | House: Committee substitute printed 10105778D-H1 | |
2010-03-03 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2010-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-08 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 10103230D-E | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB276E | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-01-26 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (14-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103230D |