VA SB302 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-28 - House: Incorporated by General Laws (SB683-Norment) by voice vote
Status: Introduced on January 8 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-28 - House: Incorporated by General Laws (SB683-Norment) by voice vote
Summary
Virginia Commission on Higher Education Board Appointments; sunset. Removes the sunset on the Virginia Commission on Higher Education Board Appointments. This bill is identical to
Title
Higher Education Board Appointments, Commission on; removes sunset provision.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-28 | House: Incorporated by General Laws (SB683-Norment) by voice vote | |
2008-02-13 | House: Assigned GL sub: Professional/Occupational/Adminstrative Process | |
2008-02-11 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-11 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-01-22 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-01-22 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-01-18 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-16 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 080689816 |
Same As/Similar To
HB776 (Same As) 2008-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0050)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB302 |