VA SB314 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0399)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0399)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Education; establishment of Farm to School Program Task Force. Requires the Department of Education to establish and appoint such members as it deems necessary or appropriate to the Farm to School Program Task Force for the purpose of increasing student access throughout the Commonwealth to high-quality farm to school programs, defined in the bill as programs (i) whereby public schools purchase and feature prominently in school meals locally produced food or (ii) that involve experiential student learning opportunities relating to local food and agriculture, including school and community garden programs and local farm visits. The bill requires the Task Force to collaborate with local school boards, community-based organizations, farmers, relevant state and local agencies, and other relevant stakeholders to (a) assess existing farm to school programs within the Commonwealth to identify and disseminate to each local school board best practices for implementing and sustaining such programs, (b) establish and distribute to each local school board a guidance document for the establishment and operation of school garden programs, (c) provide information and resources to each local school board to assist it in leveraging grant funds to support farm to school programs, and (d) collect such data and make such policy recommendations to local school boards, the Board of Education, and the General Assembly as it deems appropriate.
Title
Farm to School Program Task Force; Department of Education to establish.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (92-Y 6-N) (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (88-Y 8-N) (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (92-Y 6-N) (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (88-Y 8-N) (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0399) | |
2024-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 399 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB314ER) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2024-03-06 | House | VOTE: Adoption (92-Y 6-N) |
2024-03-06 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (92-Y 6-N) |
2024-03-06 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2024-03-05 | House | Delegates: Cousins, McQuinn, Cherry |
2024-03-05 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senators: Roem, Bagby, Head |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-29 | House | House requested conference committee |
2024-02-29 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2024-02-28 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) |
2024-02-26 | House | VOTE: Passage (88-Y 8-N) |
2024-02-26 | House | Passed House with substitute (88-Y 8-N) |
2024-02-26 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB314H1 |
2024-02-26 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24107848D-H1 |
2024-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-21 | House | Committee substitute printed 24107848D-H1 |
2024-02-21 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 2-N) |
2024-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-15 | House | Assigned Education sub: K-12 Subcommittee |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101529D |
Same As/Similar To
HB830 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0398)