VA SB321 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0589)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0589)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Protected information in administrative and civil proceedings; newspersons engaged in journalism. Expands the protected information privilege for newspersons to administrative and civil proceedings. Under current law, a newsperson engaged in journalism shall not be compelled by the Commonwealth or a locality to testify about, disclose, or produce protected information, with certain exceptions, in criminal proceedings only. Protected information in administrative and civil proceedings; newspersons engaged in journalism. Expands the protected information privilege for newspersons to administrative and civil proceedings. Under current law, a newsperson engaged in journalism shall not be compelled by the Commonwealth or a locality to testify about, disclose, or produce protected information, with certain exceptions, in criminal proceedings only.
Title
Administrative and civil proceedings; protected information, newspersons engaged in journalism.
Sponsors
Sen. Danica Roem [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (71-Y 28-N) (Y: 71 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (11-Y 10-N) (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (71-Y 28-N) (Y: 71 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (11-Y 10-N) (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0589) | |
2024-04-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 589 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB321ER) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-03-01 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | VOTE: Passage (71-Y 28-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | Passed House with amendments (71-Y 28-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2024-02-28 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2024-02-28 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2024-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-23 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (11-Y 10-N) |
2024-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-02-15 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 5-N) |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Moved from Judiciary to Courts of Justice due to a change of the committee name |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100946D |