VA SB343 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Possession or distribution of marijuana for medical purposes; cancer. Provides an affirmative defense in a prosecution for the possession of marijuana if the marijuana is in the form of cannabidiol oil or THC-A oil possessed pursuant to a valid written certification issued by a practitioner of medicine or osteopathy licensed by the Board of Medicine for purposes of treating cancer or alleviating such patient's symptoms. The bill provides that a practitioner shall not be prosecuted for distribution of marijuana under the circumstances outlined in the bill.
Title
Cancer; possession or distribution of marijuana for medical purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2016-02-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-02-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 2-N) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Courts of Justice |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100663D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 250.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3408.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |