VA SB345 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0810)
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0810)
Summary
Conditional release; voluntary admission to a state hospital. Clarifies that voluntary admission to a state hospital shall not solely constitute grounds for revocation of a person's conditional release.
Title
Conditional release; voluntary admission to a state hospital.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0810) | |
2008-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 810 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB345ER) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Read third time | |
2008-03-04 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-29 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-14 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Mental Health | |
2008-02-11 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-11 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-01-31 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-01-31 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Special on Proposed Mental Health Legislation | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 087938840 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB345 |