VA SB356 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0615)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0615)
Summary
Textbook purchasing contracts. Permits local school boards to enter into contracts or issue purchase orders with publishers for the purchase of textbooks. The bill reorganizes the textbook purchasing process and repeals several sections of outdated code. Also provides that if consumable materials are sold to students, the local school board must provide those materials at a reduced price, or free of charge, to students who are unable to afford them. This bill is identical to
Title
Textbook purchases; permits local school boards to enter into contracts with publishers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0615) | |
2008-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 615 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-05 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB356ER) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-29 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-27 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-27 | House: Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-27 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2008-02-27 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-02-27 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-26 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-25 | House: Reported from Education with amendments (21-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-12 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB356S1 | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 084085348-S1 | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-24 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 084085348-S1 | |
2008-01-24 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-16 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Public Education | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 085662348 |
Same As/Similar To
HB137 (Same As) 2008-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0430)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB356 |