VA SB367 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0702)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0702)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Driver's license and special identification card designations; persons with intellectual disabilities or autism spectrum disorder. Permits the Department of Motor Vehicles, upon the request of the applicant and presentation of a signed statement by a licensed physician confirming the applicant's condition, to designate an intellectual disability or autism spectrum disorder on the applicant's driver's license and to designate hearing or speech impairment, insulin-dependent diabetes, or an intellectual disability or autism spectrum disorder on the applicant's special identification card. Current law allows the designation of a hearing or speech impairment or a condition of insulin-dependent diabetes on a person's driver's license.
Title
Driver's licenses and special identification cards; designation of intellectual disability, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0702) | |
2014-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 702 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB367ER) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Title replaced 14105378D-H1 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-03 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-03 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-03 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB367H1 |
2014-03-03 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14105378D-H1 |
2014-03-03 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-28 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 14105378D-H1 |
2014-02-27 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-07 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2014-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100110D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 203.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 342 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 345 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |