VA SB380 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0176)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0176)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; determination of nonresponsibility; local option to include criteria in Invitation to Bid. Allows any locality to include in the Invitation to Bid criteria that may be used in determining whether a bidder who is not prequalified by the Virginia Department of Transportation is a responsible bidder. Such criteria may include a history or good faith assurances of (i) completion by the bidder and any potential subcontractors of specified safety training programs established by the U.S. Department of Labor, Occupational Safety and Health Administration; (ii) participation by the bidder and any potential subcontractors in apprenticeship training programs approved by state agencies or the U.S. Department of Labor; or (iii) maintenance by the bidder and any potential subcontractors of records of compliance with applicable local, state, and federal laws.
Title
Virginia Public Procurement Act; determination of nonresponsibility, local option.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0176) | |
2020-03-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 176 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 6, 2020 | |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 28, 2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB380ER) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-20 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (22-Y 18-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Title replaced 20108248D-H1 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (26-Y 14-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Passed House with substitute (55-Y 45-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB380H1 |
2020-02-18 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20108248D-H1 |
2020-02-18 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-17 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-13 | House | Committee substitute printed 20108248D-H1 |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (17-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20105097D-E |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB380E |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Amendment by Senator McPike agreed to |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105097D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1201 (Same As) 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1089)