VA SB4 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Castle doctrine; self-defense and defense of others. Codifies a version of the "castle doctrine," allowing the use of physical force, including deadly force, by a person in his dwelling against an intruder in the dwelling who has committed an overt act against him or another person in the dwelling, without civil liability.
Title
Castle doctrine; self-defense and defense of others.
Sponsors
Del. Thomas Garrett [R] | Sen. Stephen Newman [R] | Sen. Bryce Reeves [R] | Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Sen. William Stanley [R] | Sen. Richard Stuart [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 4-N) (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 4-N) (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 4-N) (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-10 | House: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2012-03-07 | House: Rereferred to Courts of Justice | |
2012-03-07 | House: Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to | |
2012-03-07 | House: Read third time | |
2012-03-06 | House: Read second time | |
2012-03-02 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 4-N) | |
2012-02-29 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 2-N) | |
2012-02-28 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2012-02-22 | House: Rereferred to Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-22 | House: Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to | |
2012-02-21 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-20 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-17 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-15 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105456D-H1 | |
2012-02-15 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 4-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) | |
2012-02-01 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB4S1 | |
2012-02-01 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12104738D-S1 | |
2012-02-01 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-01 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 2-N) | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 7-N) | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Incorporates SB64 | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Substitute bill reprinted 12104738D-S1 | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12104738D-S1 | |
2011-12-02 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-12-02 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100467D |
Same As/Similar To
SB64 (Similar To) 2012-01-30 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice