VA SB4 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0803)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0803)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Emergency Services and Disaster Law; limitation on duration of executive orders. Limits the duration of any executive order issued by the Governor pursuant to his powers under the Emergency Services and Disaster Law to no more than 45 days from the date of issuance. The bill provides that if the General Assembly does not take any action on the rule, regulation, or order within the 45 days during which the rule, regulation, or order is effective, the Governor shall thereafter be prohibited from issuing the same or a similar rule, regulation, or order relating to the same emergency. Under current law, once issued, such executive orders are effective until June 30 following the next regular session of the General Assembly.
Title
Emergency Services and Disaster Law; limitation on duration of executive orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (91-Y 8-N) (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0803) | |
2022-05-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 803 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-04-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., May 27, 2022 | |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Communicated to Governor on April 27, 2022 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Governor's substitute printed 22108055D-S2 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB4ER) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-09 | House | VOTE: Passage (91-Y 8-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | Passed House (91-Y 8-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | Committee on Rules substitute rejected 22107417D-H1 |
2022-03-09 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed by for the day |
2022-03-07 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 22107417D-H1 |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from Rules with substitute (18-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB4S1 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22106465D-S1 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 5-N) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Incorporates SB731 (Lewis) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Incorporates SB166 (Peake) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22106465D-S1 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (9-Y 5-N) |
2021-11-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-11-22 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100576D |
Same As/Similar To
SB166 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Incorporated by General Laws and Technology
SB731 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Incorporated by General Laws and Technology
SB166 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Incorporated by General Laws and Technology
SB731 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Incorporated by General Laws and Technology
HB158 (Same As) 2022-05-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0805)
HB158 (Same As) 2022-05-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0805)
SB731 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Incorporated by General Laws and Technology
SB166 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Incorporated by General Laws and Technology
SB731 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Incorporated by General Laws and Technology
HB158 (Same As) 2022-05-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0805)
HB158 (Same As) 2022-05-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0805)