VA SB404 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-21 - House: Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-21 - House: Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Summary
Substance abuse screening and assessment of VIEW applicants and participants. Requires local departments of social services to conduct a screening of all applicants and participants of VIEW. This bill provides that where a screening indicates probable cause to believe an applicant or participant is using illegal drugs, the applicant or participant may be required to submit to drug testing. Where a drug test indicates that the applicant or participant is using illegal drugs, the person shall be referred to a treatment program and all TANF payments shall be made to a third party payee for the benefit of members of the applicant's or recipient's household. If a person fails or refuses to participate in a screening, assessment, or required rehabilitation program, that person shall be ineligible for TANF assistance. Persons deemed ineligible for TANF assistance on the basis of failure or refusal to participate in a screening, assessment, or required rehabilitation program, will be ineligible for a period of twelve months but shall have one opportunity to comply and be reinstated once during the twelve month period.
Title
Substance abuse screening; person become ineligible for public assistance if using illegal drugs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-21 | House: Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote | |
2008-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2008-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB404S1 | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 088554300-S1 | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 088554300-S1 | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 087850300 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB404 |