VA SB414 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0572)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0572)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorized tourism project; sales and use tax revenues. Clarifies that the amount of revenue to which the authorized tourism project is entitled is equal to the amount of revenue generated by a one percent sales and use tax on transactions taking place on the premises of the project.
Title
Retail Sales and Use Tax; clarifies amount of revenue authorized tourism project is entitled.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0572) | |
2012-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 572 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-27 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB414ER) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-02-22 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-22 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-22 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-21 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-20 | House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-15 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #1 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-27 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103722D |
Same As/Similar To
HB581 (Same As) 2012-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0073)