VA SB420 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Sex Offender Registry; listing of laws. Requires the Attorney General to annually prepare a listing of laws containing requirements and prohibitions affecting persons who must register as sex offenders and to communicate the list to the Departments of Corrections, Juvenile Justice, and State Police.
Title
Sex Offender Registry; notification of laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (7-Y 7-N) (Y: 7 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (7-Y 7-N) (Y: 7 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-10 | House: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-29 | House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely by voice vote | |
2012-02-16 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-08 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB420S1 | |
2012-02-08 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12104903D-S1 | |
2012-02-08 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-08 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12104903D-S1 | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Reconsidered by Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (7-Y 7-N) | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101081D |