VA SB440 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0539)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0539)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Campus police and security departments; DCJS to conduct study to identify potential minimum core operational functions. Requires the Department of Criminal Justice Services to conduct a study to identify potential minimum core operational functions for college campus police and security departments. In conducting this study, the Department shall determine the cost to bring existing departments into compliance with such functions and legislative amendments needed in order to require compliance.
Title
College campus police and security departments; DCJS to identify minimum core operational functions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 2-N) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0539) | |
2014-04-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 539 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB440ER) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-25 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 2-N) |
2014-02-25 | House | Passed House (93-Y 2-N) |
2014-02-25 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-21 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 2-N) |
2014-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2014-02-14 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2014-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2014-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB440S1 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14104794D-S1 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Committee amendments rejected |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Rules with substitute (10-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14104794D-S1 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Rules |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101398D |
Same As/Similar To
HB587 (Same As) 2014-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0278)