VA SB441 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0576)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0576)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Payment for burial expenses; Line of Duty Act. Authorizes the State Comptroller to release payments, advanced from the death benefits due to the beneficiary of a deceased person under the Line of Duty Act, to a funeral service provider for burial and transportation costs.
Title
Line of Duty Act; expeditious payment for burial expense for person whose death is in line of duty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0576) | |
2012-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 576 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB441ER) | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-03-05 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (97-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House | |
2012-03-05 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Read third time | |
2012-03-02 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-29 | House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-17 | House: Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-03 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB441S1 | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12104538D-S1 | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12104538D-S1 | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12104081D |
Same As/Similar To
HB395 (Same As) 2012-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0090)