VA SB45 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0807)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0807)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Open Education Curriculum Board. Alters the function of the Open Education Curriculum Board from a policy board to an advisory board. In its new role, the Open Education Curriculum Board shall advise the Governor and the Board of Education on the creation, collection, categorization, distribution, and licensing of open educational resources and the integration of those resources with Virginia's Standards of Learning.
Title
Open Education Curriculum Board; alters function from a policy board to an advisory board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day in General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day in General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0807) | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 807 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-04-18 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB45ER2) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (93-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-17 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-04-09 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-07 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-07 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB45ER) | |
2012-03-07 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-03-02 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-02 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-02 | House: Read third time | |
2012-03-01 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-29 | House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | House: Assigned Education sub: Teachers and Admin. Action | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-01-27 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-04 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2012-01-04 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101258D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Education
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Education
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 2462 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2463 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2464 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |