VA SB469 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0850)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0850)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Primary ballot; certain required statements as qualification for candidacy; failure to timely file. Provides that the name of any person who does not file his written statement of qualification or statement of economic interests by the relevant deadline, or by the end of an extension period if an extension of the deadline has been granted by the State Board of Elections, shall not be printed on the primary election ballot.
Title
Primary ballot; certain required statements as qualification for candidacy, failure to timely file.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0850) | |
2020-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 850 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB469ER) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-04 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Read third time |
2020-03-03 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102330D |