VA SB489 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0751)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0751)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Possession with intent to distribute tax-paid, contraband cigarettes; authorized holder. Clarifies that it is not necessary to prove that the perpetrator is not an authorized holder in order for such perpetrator to be guilty of the crime of possession with intent to distribute tax-paid contraband cigarettes.
Title
Cigarettes, tax-paid contraband; penalty for possession with intent to distribute, exception.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 6-N) (Y: 96 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Fin. (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Fin. (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0751) | |
2014-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 751 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB489ER) |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-26 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 6-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed House with amendments (94-Y 6-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2014-02-26 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2014-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-21 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (19-Y 2-N) |
2014-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 1-N) |
2014-02-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred from Finance by voice vote |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 14102695D-E |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB489E |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Courts of Justice |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Rereferred from Fin. (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102695D |