VA SB493 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0720)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0720)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Records concerning electronic communication service or remote computing service. Clarifies that any provider of electronic communication service or remote computing service, including a foreign corporation that provides electronic communication service or remote computing service, shall disclose a record or other information pertaining to a subscriber to or customer of such service, excluding the contents of electronic communications, to an investigative or law-enforcement officer pursuant to (1) a search warrant issued by a magistrate, general district court or a circuit court; (2) a court order for such disclosure issued as provided in this section; or (3) the consent of the subscriber or customer to such disclosure.
Title
Electronic communication service; foreign corporation to disclose record of subscriber to officer.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Hurt [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION #2 (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: --- AGREE TO (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION #2 (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: --- AGREE TO (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0720) | |
2010-04-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 720 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-15 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-14 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB493ER) | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-09 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION #2 (94-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Constitutional reading dispensed BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Motion to reconsider constitutional reading dispensed agreed to | |
2010-03-09 | House: VOTE: --- AGREE TO (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Constitutional reading dispensed BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Read second time | |
2010-03-08 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-17 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2010-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-15 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101882D |