VA SB497 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0822)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0822)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Retirement System employee contributions; local employees; school board employees. Requires that persons employed by local government or school board employers be required to pay the five percent employee contribution to the Virginia Retirement System. Employers would be authorized to phase in the five percent contribution over a maximum of five years, and would be required to provide employees with a raise to offset the employee contributions.
Title
Virginia Retirement System; local government and school board employees, contributions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (64-Y 26-N) (Y: 66 N: 26 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (55-Y 38-N) (Y: 57 N: 38 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 35-N) (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (55-Y 38-N) (Y: 57 N: 38 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 35-N) (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0822) | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 822 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-04-18 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB497ER2) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (64-Y 26-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (64-Y 26-N) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (33-Y 6-N) | |
2012-04-17 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-04-09 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2012-03-17 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-15 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-15 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB497ER) | |
2012-03-15 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House reprinted (SB497ER) | |
2012-03-15 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-03-10 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (55-Y 38-N) | |
2012-03-10 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (55-Y 38-N) | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (34-Y 6-N) | |
2012-03-08 | House: Delegates: Howell, W.J., Jones, Joannou | |
2012-03-08 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Senators: Watkins, Wagner, Howell | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-07 | House: House requested conference committee | |
2012-03-07 | House: House insisted on substitute | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 35-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Passed House with substitute (62-Y 35-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB497H1 | |
2012-03-05 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12105702D-H1 | |
2012-03-05 | House: Read third time | |
2012-03-02 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-29 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105702D-H1 | |
2012-02-29 | House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-17 | House: Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement | |
2012-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 2-N) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 12105343D-ES1 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB497ES1 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Amendments by Senator Watkins agreed to | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12105343D-S1 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12105343D-S1 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 1-N) | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103399D |