VA SB498 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0823)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0823)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Retirement System; hybrid defined contribution and defined benefit retirement program. Creates a new hybrid retirement program, administered by the Virginia Retirement System, that contains a defined contribution and a defined benefit component. All new state employees, local employees, and judges commencing employment on or after January 1, 2014, would be required to participate in the hybrid plan. Employees in service on December 31, 2013, would be given the opportunity to make a one-time, irrevocable election to participate in the new hybrid program. The bill also creates a disability program for local employees participating in the hybrid plan. The bill also makes adjustments to the existing defined benefit plan for nonvested employees, including lowering the retirement benefit multiplier from 1.7 to 1.65, basing average final compensation on 60 months of service instead of 36, and capping the cost-of-living adjustment at three percent. Any person with less than 20 years service who takes early retirement would not receive a cost-of-living adjustment until one year after he reaches normal retirement age.
Title
Retirement System; hybrid retirement program created, optional defined retirement plan created, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (57-Y 37-N) (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (58-Y 35-N) (Y: 60 N: 35 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 34-N) (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (58-Y 35-N) (Y: 60 N: 35 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 34-N) (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0823) | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 823 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-04-18 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB498ER2) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (57-Y 37-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (57-Y 37-N) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (33-Y 6-N) | |
2012-04-17 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-04-09 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2012-03-17 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-15 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-15 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB498ER) | |
2012-03-15 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-03-10 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (58-Y 35-N) | |
2012-03-10 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (58-Y 35-N) | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: Conference substitute printed 12106172D-S2 | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 5-N) | |
2012-03-08 | House: Delegates: Howell, W.J., Jones, Joannou | |
2012-03-08 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Senators: Watkins, Wagner, Howell | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-07 | House: House requested conference committee | |
2012-03-07 | House: House insisted on substitute | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 34-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Passed House with substitute (62-Y 34-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB498H1 | |
2012-03-05 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12105697D-H1 | |
2012-03-05 | House: Read third time | |
2012-03-02 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-29 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105697D-H1 | |
2012-02-29 | House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (18-Y 4-N) | |
2012-02-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-17 | House: Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement | |
2012-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB498S1 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12105257D-S1 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12105257D-S1 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102731D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1130 (Same As) 2012-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0701)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
51 | 1 | 1100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 1150 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 1185 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 135 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 138 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 1400 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 1401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 1402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 1403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 1405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 145 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 170 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 212 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 213 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 601.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 603.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 608 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 609 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 611 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |