VA SB502 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-09 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-09 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Petitions in juvenile and domestic relations district court; parents; minors. Prohibits the parent of a minor residing in the same home as such parent from filing a petition for a family abuse protective order against such minor, provided that the minor has not otherwise been emancipated pursuant to law. The bill also authorizes the parent, guardian, or other person standing in loco parentis of a minor to file a petition for a child in need of services or in need of supervision with the clerk of the juvenile and domestic relations district court if an intake officer refuses to file such petition. Under current law, the decision by an intake officer to file such petition is final. Petitions in juvenile and domestic relations district court; parents; minors. Prohibits the parent of a minor residing in the same home as such parent from filing a petition for a family abuse protective order against such minor, provided that the minor has not otherwise been emancipated pursuant to law. The bill also authorizes the parent, guardian, or other person standing in loco parentis of a minor to file a petition for a child in need of services or in need of supervision with the clerk of the juvenile and domestic relations district court if an intake officer refuses to file such petition. Under current law, the decision by an intake officer to file such petition is final.
Title
Juvenile & domestic relations district ct.; parent filing petion for protective order against minor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 44-N) (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 44-N) (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-09 | Senate | Failed to pass in Senate |
2024-03-09 | Senate | No further action taken |
2024-03-06 | House | Delegates: Hope, Herring, Kilgore |
2024-03-06 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senators: Surovell, Aird, McDougle |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-04 | House | House requested conference committee |
2024-03-04 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2024-03-01 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | VOTE: Passage (53-Y 44-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | Passed House with substitute (53-Y 44-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB502H1 |
2024-02-28 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24108138D-H1 |
2024-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-23 | House | Committee substitute printed 24108138D-H1 |
2024-02-23 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 9-N) |
2024-02-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-02-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2024-02-16 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-02-16 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB502S1 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24107537D-S1 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24107537D-S1 |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (5-Y 4-N) |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100778D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 253.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 253.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 260 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 279.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |