VA SB5067 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 17 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-02 - Stricken from Senate calendar (37-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Immunity from civil claims related to the transmission of or exposure to the COVID-19 virus; emergency. Provides immunity to a person, as defined in the bill, from civil causes of action arising from any act or omission alleged to have resulted in the contraction of or exposure to the COVID-19 virus, provided such person has complied with applicable and the most recent federal, state, and local laws, policies, procedures, and guidance regarding COVID-19. The bill requires every person to provide, with respect to any premises owned by the person or under the person's possession, custody, or control, reasonable notice of actions taken by the person for the purpose of reducing the risk of transmission of COVID-19 to individuals present on the premises. The bill contains an emergency clause and specifies that the provisions apply to claims arising no later than 180 days after the expiration or revocation of all states of emergency declared by the Governor related to the COVID-19 pandemic.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COVID-19 virus; immunity from civil claims related to transmission of or exposure to the virus.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-02 - Senate - Senate: Stricken from Senate calendar (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-02SenateStricken from Senate calendar (37-Y 0-N)
2020-09-02SenateFloor substitute printed 20201112D-S2 (Petersen)
2020-08-28SenatePassed by for the day
2020-08-27SenateRead first time
2020-08-26SenateCommittee substitute printed 20201033D-S1
2020-08-26SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (10-Y 3-N)
2020-08-17SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-08-17SenatePrefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 08/18/20 20200640D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback