VA SB5120 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0001)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriation; Department of Elections. Appropriates $2,000,000 to the Department of Elections to be used to provide prepaid postage for the return of absentee ballots for the November 3, 2020, election. The bill requires that such prepaid postage be provided by localities, which will be reimbursed by the Department out of the appropriation. The bill also makes other procedural changes for absentee voting for the November 3, 2020, election, including directing the State Board of Elections to promulgate guidelines for the establishment and operation of drop-off locations for completed ballots.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections, Department of; appropriations to provide prepaid postage for return of absentee ballots.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 16-N) (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Ruff rejected (15-Y 21-N) (Y: 15 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate: Amendment #2 by Senator Newman rejected (15-Y 21-N) (Y: 15 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-08-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-04 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0001)
2020-09-04 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1 (effective 9/4/20)
2020-09-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., September 11, 2020
2020-09-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on September 4, 2020
2020-09-04HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-09-04SenateSigned by President
2020-09-04SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB5120ER)
2020-09-04HouseEnrolled
2020-09-04HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N)
2020-09-04HousePassed House (55-Y 43-N)
2020-09-04HousePassed by temporarily
2020-09-04HouseRead third time
2020-09-03HouseRead second time
2020-09-02HouseReported from Appropriations (13-Y 8-N)
2020-09-02HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-09-02HouseRead first time
2020-09-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-08-28SenateRead third time and passed Senate (21-Y 16-N)
2020-08-27SenatePrinted as engrossed 20201001D-ES2
2020-08-27SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute with amendment SB5120ES2
2020-08-27SenateAmendment by Senator Ruff rejected (15-Y 21-N)
2020-08-27SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-08-27SenateAmendment #2 by Senator Newman rejected (15-Y 21-N)
2020-08-27SenateAmendment #1 by Senator Newman out of order
2020-08-27SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-08-27SenateAmendment by Senator Deeds agreed to
2020-08-27SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-08-27SenateSubstitute by Senator Howell agreed to 20201001D-S2
2020-08-27SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-08-27SenateCommittee substitute rejected 20200947D-S1
2020-08-27SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-08-27SenateRead second time
2020-08-27SenateFloor substitute printed 20201001D-S2 (Howell)
2020-08-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N)
2020-08-24SenateCommittee substitute printed 20200947D-S1
2020-08-24SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (11-Y 5-N)
2020-08-21SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2020-08-21SenatePresented and ordered printed 20200923D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+sum+SB5120&202+sum+SB5120
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5120+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5120S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5120S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5120ES2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5120ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+CHAP0001+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S05V0001+SB5120
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0032SB5120+SB5120
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0053SB5120+SB5120
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H02V0016+SB5120
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0040SB5120+SB5120
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0039SB5120+SB5120
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0045+SB5120

Bill Comments

feedback