VA SB517 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0702)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0702)
Summary
Public body contracts; illegal alien employment. Requires that all public bodies provide in every written contract that the contractor does not, and shall not during the performance of the contract for goods and services in the Commonwealth, knowingly employ an unauthorized alien as defined in the federal Immigration Reform and Control Act of 1986. This bill is identical to
Title
Contractors; shall not knowingly employ unauthorized alien.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0702) | |
2008-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 702 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB517ER) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB517H1 | |
2008-03-05 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 081499216-H1 | |
2008-03-05 | House: Read third time | |
2008-03-05 | House: Substitute bill reprinted 081499216-H1 | |
2008-03-04 | House: Read second time | |
2008-03-03 | House: Committee substitute printed 081499216-H1 | |
2008-02-29 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-14 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2008-02-12 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-12 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB517S1 | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 080285216-S1 | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 080285216-S1 | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Special on Immigration | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 080442806 |
Same As/Similar To
HB1298 (Same As) 2008-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0598)
Subjects
Administration of Government
Foreign Governments and Countries
Labor and Employment
Professions and Occupations
Foreign Governments and Countries
Labor and Employment
Professions and Occupations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB517 |