VA SB522 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-09 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-09 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Purchase of firearms; demonstrated competence with a firearm or completion of a firearms safety or training course; penalty. Requires that a prospective purchaser of a firearm present proof that such prospective purchaser has demonstrated competence with a firearm or completed a firearms safety or training course, as specified in the bill, within the past five years.
Title
Purchase of firearms; demonstrated competence with a firearm or completion of training course.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 49-N) (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 49-N) (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-09 | Senate | Failed to pass in Senate |
2024-03-09 | Senate | No further action taken |
2024-03-06 | House | Delegates: Simon, Helmer, Webert |
2024-03-06 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senators: Williams Graves, Carroll Foy, Peake |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-04 | House | House requested conference committee |
2024-03-04 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2024-03-01 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | VOTE: Passage (51-Y 49-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | Passed House with substitute (51-Y 49-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB522H1 |
2024-02-28 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24108226D-H1 |
2024-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-23 | House | Committee substitute printed 24108226D-H1 |
2024-02-23 | House | Reported from Public Safety with substitute (12-Y 9-N) |
2024-02-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2025 by voice vote |
2024-02-19 | House | Assigned PS sub: Firearms |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 5-N) |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N) |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104570D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 308.2:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.2:5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |