VA SB531 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0825)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0825)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Northern Virginia Transportation District; long-range planning. Establishes responsibilities for various entities for long-range transportation planning for the Northern Virginia Transportation District.
Title
Northern Virginia Transportation District; responsibilities of Transportation Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (59-Y 36-N) (Y: 60 N: 37 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (64-Y 34-N) (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (56-Y 42-N) (Y: 56 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (64-Y 34-N) (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (56-Y 42-N) (Y: 56 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0825) | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 825 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-04-18 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB531ER2) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (59-Y 36-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (59-Y 36-N) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-17 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-04-09 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2012-03-10 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB531ER) | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-03-09 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 3-N) | |
2012-03-09 | Senate: Conference substitute printed 12105966D-S2 | |
2012-03-08 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (64-Y 34-N) | |
2012-03-08 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (64-Y 34-N) | |
2012-03-06 | House: Delegates: LeMunyon, May, Filler-Corn | |
2012-03-06 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Senators: McWaters, Smith, Marsden | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | House: House requested conference committee | |
2012-03-01 | House: House insisted on substitute | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) | |
2012-02-27 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (56-Y 42-N) | |
2012-02-27 | House: Passed House with substitute (56-Y 42-N) | |
2012-02-27 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB531H1 | |
2012-02-27 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12105537D-H1 | |
2012-02-27 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-24 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-23 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105537D-H1 | |
2012-02-23 | House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (20-Y 2-N) | |
2012-02-20 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-17 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #1 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB531S1 | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12104993D-S1 | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-01 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12104993D-S1 | |
2012-02-01 | Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 12103970D |
Same As/Similar To
HB599 (Same As) 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0768)