VA SB537 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0546)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0546)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Offenses requiring registration; withdrawal of plea by certain defendants. Provides that prior to conviction for an offense requiring registration on the Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry due to the minority, physical helplessness, or mental incapacity of the victim, when the indictment, warrant, or information does not allege that the victim of the offense was a minor, physically helpless, or mentally incapacitated, the court shall determine whether the victim was a minor, physically helpless, or mentally incapacitated. The bill also provides that when the court is required to make such determination, it shall advise the defendant of his right to make a motion to withdraw a plea of guilty or nolo contendere. If the court grants the defendant's motion to withdraw his plea, the case shall be heard by another judge unless the parties agree otherwise. The bill further provides that failure to make a determination as to the minority, physical helplessness, or mental incapacity of the victim or so advise the defendant of his right to make a motion to withdraw his plea does not otherwise invalidate the conviction.
Title
Offenses requiring registration; withdrawal of plea by certain defendants, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0546) | |
2014-04-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 546 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB537ER) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Title replaced 14105328D-H1 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2014-03-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-05 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-05 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB537H1 |
2014-03-05 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14105328D-H1 |
2014-03-05 | House | Read third time |
2014-03-04 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 14105328D-H1 |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB537S1 |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14104750D-S1 |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14104750D-S1 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100978D |
Subjects
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services
Commonwealth Public Safety
Criminal Procedure
Minors
Persons with Disabilities
Commonwealth Public Safety
Criminal Procedure
Minors
Persons with Disabilities