VA SB549 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Machinery and Tools Investment Grant Program. Creates a grant program that would allow a person to apply for a grant for machinery and tools in service less than two years equal to the amount of local machinery and tools taxes paid. The amount of the grant would be capped at the amount of taxes that would be paid under that rate of tax imposed on June 30, 2012. The grant program would be administered by the Department of Accounts.
Title
Machinery and Tools Investment Grant Program; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-10 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2012-02-17 | House: Assigned App. sub: Economic Development, Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2012-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB549S2 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Substitute by Senator Wagner agreed to 12105399D-S2 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Floor substitute printed 12105399D-S2 (Wagner) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Committee substitute rejected 12105252D-S1 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12105252D-S1 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 2-N) | |
2012-01-16 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-01-16 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 12103540D |