VA SB560 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 6 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-07 - Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto
Status: Vetoed on March 6 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-07 - Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto
Summary
Redefinition of the triggerman rule. Redefines the "triggerman rule," which currently provides that only the actual perpetrator of a capital murder is eligible for the death penalty and that accessories and principals in the second degree can be punished only as if guilty of first degree murder. This bill allows principals in the second degree and accessories before the fact to be charged as principals in the first degree in the cases of murder for hire, murder involving a continuing criminal enterprise, and terrorism. This bill allows, in all other cases of capital murder, a principal in the second degree to be tried as a principal in the first degree if he had the same intent to kill as the principal in the first degree. The bill allows an accessory before the fact to be tried as a principal in the first degree if he ordered or directed the willful, deliberate, and premeditated killing. This bill is identical to
Title
Triggerman rule; redefinition thereof.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-07 | Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto | |
2008-03-07 | Senate: Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (24-Y 16-N) | |
2008-03-06 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-25 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB560ER) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-02-22 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (78-Y 17-N) | |
2008-02-22 | House: Passed House (78-Y 17-N) | |
2008-02-22 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-21 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-20 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-19 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-15 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 2-N) | |
2008-02-14 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-02-12 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-12 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 14-N) | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (8-Y 7-N) | |
2008-01-14 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 086244288 |
Same As/Similar To
HB933 (Same As) 2008-03-07 - Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB560 |