VA SB599 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0514)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0514)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Bonds for public institutions of higher learning; emergency. Authorizes issuance of bonds in an amount up to $124,285,000 for revenue-producing capital projects at James Madison University, Virginia State University, and The College of William and Mary in Virginia.
Title
Commonwealth of Virginia Higher Educational Institutions Bond Act of 2024; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0514) | |
2024-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 514 (effective 4/4/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB599ER) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-22 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-22 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y -0-N) |
2024-02-22 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-19 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 24102812D-E |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB599E |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/10/24 24102812D |
Same As/Similar To
HB711 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0450)
Subjects
Bond Issues
Emergency Legislation
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Uncodified Legislation
Emergency Legislation
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Uncodified Legislation