VA SB601 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0721)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0721)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation District Commission of Hampton Roads. Staggers the terms of the Governor's appointments to the commission.
Title
Hampton Roads, Transportation District Commission of; staggers terms of gubernatorial appointees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 3-N) (Y: 98 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (6-Y 34-N) (Y: 6 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (6-Y 34-N) (Y: 6 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0721) | |
2014-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 721 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB601ER) |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-03-07 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 3-N) |
2014-03-07 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 3-N) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-06 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-03-06 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2014-03-05 | House | Delegates: Howell, A.T., Habeeb, Rust |
2014-03-05 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senators: Alexander, Lucas, Cosgrove |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-03 | House | House requested conference committee |
2014-03-03 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2014-02-28 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (6-Y 34-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed House with substitute (95-Y 3-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute SB601H1 |
2014-02-26 | House | Substitute by Delegate Howell, A.T. agreed to 14105343D-H1 |
2014-02-26 | House | Floor substitute printed 14105343D-H1 (Howell, A.T.) |
2014-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-25 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-21 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-14 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2014-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB601S1 |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14104795D-S1 |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14104795D-S1 |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 14103809D |
Same As/Similar To
HB400 (Same As) 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0655)
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Counties, Cities, and Towns
Governor
Hampton Roads Area
Transportation
Counties, Cities, and Towns
Governor
Hampton Roads Area
Transportation