VA SB613 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0009)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0009)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Institutions of higher education; campus safety; governing boards of certain educational institutions; employment of security services and personnel authorized. Authorizes the governing board of certain educational institutions, including the A.L. Philpott Manufacturing Extension Partnership, the Institute for Advanced Learning and Research, the New College Institute, the Roanoke Higher Education Authority, the Southern Virginia Higher Education Center, and the Southwest Virginia Higher Education Center, to establish and maintain a campus security department and to employ security personnel. Under current law, the governing board of any such educational institution is only authorized to contract for security services.
Title
Higher educational institutions; campus safety, governing board of certain educational institutions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0009) | |
2024-03-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 9 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 1, 2024 |
2024-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House reprinted (SB613ER) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB613ER) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-19 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-19 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-14 | House | Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Assigned Education and Health Sub: Higher Education |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103138D |
Same As/Similar To
HB690 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0202)