VA SB614 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0831)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0831)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local sales tax distribution; correction of erroneous payments. Requires the state to make adjustments in the next month's distribution of sales tax revenues to a locality after it is discovered that an error in payment was made. Current law allows the adjustment to be made over a period of six months.
Title
Local sales tax distribution; correction of erroneous payments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Finance (17-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Finance (17-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0831) | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 831 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-04-18 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB614ER2) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (95-Y 1-N) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-17 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-04-09 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-27 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB614ER) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-02-22 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-22 | House: Passed House (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-22 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-21 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-20 | House: Reported from Finance (17-Y 3-N) | |
2012-02-15 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #1 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) | |
2012-01-27 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Reported from Finance (10-Y 5-N) | |
2012-01-19 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-01-19 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 12103541D | |
2012-01-19 | Senate: Unanimous consent to introduce |