VA SB623 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Higher education; mental health treatment coordination. Requires the governing board of each four-year public institution of higher education to establish a written memorandum of understanding with their local community services board or behavioral health authority, local hospitals, and other local mental health facilities in order to expand the scope of services available to students seeking treatment. Each four-year institution of higher education shall designate a contact person to be notified when a student is involuntarily committed, or when a student is discharged from a facility and he consents to such notification. Each memorandum shall include the institution of higher education in the post-discharge planning of a student who has been committed and intends to return to campus, to the extent allowable under state and federal privacy laws.
Title
Higher educational institutions; mental health treatment coordination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-10 | House: Left in Education | |
2012-02-21 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-02-14 | House: Assigned Education sub: Higher Education and Arts | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB623S1 | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12105006D-S1 | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12105006D-S1 | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Higher Education | |
2012-01-20 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2012-01-20 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 12104179D |
Subjects
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, Department of
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Education
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Education