VA SB641 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Air pollution; outdoor wood-burning heaters. Requires the Air Pollution Control Board to develop a model ordinance for localities that could be used, at the discretion of the locality, to regulate air pollution emissions resulting from the use of outdoor hydronic heaters such as residential wood-fired boilers.
Title
Air pollution; regulating emissions resulting from use of outdoor wood-burning heaters.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 4-N) (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-10 | House: Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2012-02-22 | House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 4-N) | |
2012-02-20 | House: Assigned ACNRsub: Natural Resources | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-01 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 3-N) | |
2012-01-20 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-20 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 12103644D |