VA SB645 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0426)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0426)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local fiscal distress; determination by Auditor of Public Accounts; state intervention. Sets out a procedure for determining when localities are in fiscal distress, as defined in the bill, and when state intervention may be necessary. The bill requires the Auditor of Public Accounts to develop criteria for a preliminary determination that a locality may be in fiscal distress. The bill also requires the Director of the Department of Planning and Budget to identify any amounts remaining unexpended from general fund appropriations in the state budget as of June 30 of each year, which constitute state aid to local governments. From such unexpended balances, the Governor may reappropriate up to $750,000 from amounts that would otherwise revert to the balance of the general fund and transfer such amounts as necessary to establish a component of fund balance that may be used for the purpose of providing state assistance, oversight, and intervention actions for localities deemed to be fiscally distressed and in need of state assistance, oversight, or intervention to address such distress. The bill provides that if a report to the Governor concludes that a locality located in Planning District 19 (Crater Planning District Commission) is either unwilling or unable to comply with the conditions necessary to address its fiscal distress, the Commission on Local Government shall appoint an emergency fiscal manager and implement a remediation plan to restore sustainable fiscal health to such locality. The emergency fiscal officer shall give timely notice of any proposed actions to be taken and an opportunity for public input prior to such action and shall establish benchmarks that will allow such locality to exit the state intervention plan upon meeting such benchmarks. Local fiscal distress; determination by Auditor of Public Accounts; state intervention. Sets out a procedure for determining when localities are in fiscal distress, as defined in the bill, and when state intervention may be necessary. The bill requires the Auditor of Public Accounts to develop criteria for a preliminary determination that a locality may be in fiscal distress. The bill also requires the Director of the Department of Planning and Budget to identify any amounts remaining unexpended from general fund appropriations in the state budget as of June 30 of each year, which constitute state aid to local governments. From such unexpended balances, the Governor may reappropriate up to $750,000 from amounts that would otherwise revert to the balance of the general fund and transfer such amounts as necessary to establish a component of fund balance that may be used for the purpose of providing state assistance, oversight, and intervention actions for localities deemed to be fiscally distressed and in need of state assistance, oversight, or intervention to address such distress. The bill provides that if a report to the Governor concludes that a locality located in Planning District 19 (Crater Planning District Commission) is either unwilling or unable to comply with the conditions necessary to address its fiscal distress, the Commission on Local Government shall appoint an emergency fiscal manager and implement a remediation plan to restore sustainable fiscal health to such locality. The emergency fiscal officer shall give timely notice of any proposed actions to be taken and an opportunity for public input prior to such action and shall establish benchmarks that will allow such locality to exit the state intervention plan upon meeting such benchmarks.
Title
Local fiscal distress; determination by Auditor of Public Accounts, state intervention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (91-Y 7-N) (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment(s) (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (9-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (8-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (91-Y 7-N) (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment(s) (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (9-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (8-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0426) | |
2024-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 426 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB645ER) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-03-05 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (34-Y 6-N) |
2024-03-04 | House | VOTE: Passage (91-Y 7-N) |
2024-03-04 | House | Passed House with amendment (91-Y 7-N) |
2024-03-04 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2024-03-04 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2024-03-04 | House | Read third time |
2024-03-01 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-28 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment(s) (19-Y 3-N) |
2024-02-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 2-N) |
2024-02-19 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 24106727D-ES1 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB645ES1 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Aird agreed to |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24106727D-S1 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (9-Y 5-N 1-A) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24106727D-S1 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with substitute (8-Y 6-N 1-A) |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 24104569D |
Same As/Similar To
HB655 (Similar To) 2024-02-13 - VOTE: Defeated (43-Y 55-N)
Subjects
Auditor of Public Accounts
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Counties Cities and Towns
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Counties Cities and Towns
Study Commissions Committees and Reports