VA SB65 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0778)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0778)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Psychiatric treatment of minors. Revises the Psychiatric Inpatient Treatment of Minors Act in order to create a stand alone juvenile commitment act that will be titled the Psychiatric Treatment of Minors Act and to eliminate various cross references to the adult commitment statutes in Title 37.2. The bill incorporates various provisions from the adult commitment statutes, including provisions regarding the transportation of persons in the commitment process, the preparation of preadmission screening reports, and the process for emergency custody and temporary detention orders, into the Act. The bill also revises the appeals process, reducing the time to note an appeal from 30 to 10 days, which is consistent with other appeals from the juvenile and domestic relations district court.
Title
Psychiatric treatment; revises Psychiatric Inpatient Treatment of Minors Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION #2 (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: --- AGREE TO (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION #2 (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: --- AGREE TO (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0778) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Enacted, Chapter 778 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB65ER2) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2010-04-21 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-20 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-04-13 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2010-03-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-22 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB65ER) | |
2010-03-22 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Title replaced 10105790D-H1 | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Passed House with substitute with amendment BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment SB65H1 | |
2010-03-09 | House: Amendment by Delegate Kilgore agreed to | |
2010-03-09 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10105790D-H1 | |
2010-03-09 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION #2 (94-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Constitutional reading dispensed BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Motion to reconsider constitutional reading dispensed agreed to | |
2010-03-09 | House: VOTE: --- AGREE TO (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Constitutional reading dispensed BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Read second time | |
2010-03-08 | House: Committee substitute printed 10105790D-H1 | |
2010-03-08 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-05 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-18 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #3 Mental Health | |
2010-02-17 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-02-17 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB65S1 | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10104897D-S1 | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10104897D-S1 | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-18 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Mental Health | |
2010-01-04 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-04 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102678D |
Same As/Similar To
HB248 (Same As) 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0825)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 1704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1724 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 280 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 335 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 336.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 339 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 340 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 340.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 340.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 340.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 340.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 345.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 347 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 13 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 127.1:03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 808 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 809 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 812 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 813 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2400.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 389 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |