VA SB650 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0363)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0363)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Fire Programs; work group; options for local government employees who respond to emergencies with toxic material exposure. Directs the Department of Fire Programs to convene a work group to identify and analyze options to help ensure that local government employees who respond to emergencies that expose them to toxic materials have appropriate preemptive and ongoing health care and are able to pay any health expenses related to such emergency and its aftereffects that are not covered by relevant health insurance plans. The work group is directed to report its findings to the General Assembly by November 1, 2024.
Title
Local government; ongoing health care for employees exposed to toxic materials.
Sponsors
Sen. Aaron Rouse [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0363) | |
2024-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 363 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB650ER) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Title replaced 24108426D-S1 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-04 | House | VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-04 | House | Passed House with substitute (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB650H1 |
2024-03-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24108426D-H1 |
2024-03-04 | House | Read third time |
2024-03-01 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 24108426D-H1 |
2024-02-28 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 2-N) |
2024-02-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-23 | House | Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-22 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies Subcommittee |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB650S1 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24107357D-S1 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24107357D-S1 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 24102506D |
Same As/Similar To
HB133 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0174)
Subjects
Counties Cities and Towns
Local Government and Officials
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation
Local Government and Officials
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation