VA SB652 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-5)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-21 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-21 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibited conduct; Governor and Attorney General; parties to litigation with the state; penalties. Prohibits acceptance by the Governor or Attorney General of campaign contributions or gifts worth more than $50 from parties who oppose the state in ongoing litigation and prohibits making such contributions and gifts. The bill imposes civil penalties.
Title
Governor and Attorney General; parties to litigation with state, prohibited conduct, penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-21 | House | Incorporated by Courts of Justice |
2014-02-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (SB649-Norment) by voice vote |
2014-02-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Ethics |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Rules (12-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Rereferred to Rules |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Rereferred from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 14103397D |
Same As/Similar To
SB649 (Similar To) 2014-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0804)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 450.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3104.03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |