VA SB653 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0659)
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0659)
Summary
Southwest Virginia Cultural Heritage Commission. Creates the Southwest Virginia Cultural Heritage Commission in the executive branch of state government to encourage the economic development of Southwest Virginia through the expansion of cultural heritage ventures and initiatives related to tourism and other asset-based enterprises, including the Southwest Virginia Artisan Center, the Crooked Road, Round The Mountain, and related cultural heritage organizations and venues that promote entrepreneurial and employment opportunities. This bill is identical to
Title
Southwest Virginia Cultural Heritage Commission, created.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0659) | |
2008-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 659 (effective 3/27/08) | |
2008-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB653ER) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2008-03-05 | Senate: Emergency clause added | |
2008-03-05 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-03-05 | House: Read third time | |
2008-03-04 | House: Read second time | |
2008-03-03 | House: Reported from Rules with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-12 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB653S1 | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 087311344-S1 | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 087311344-S1 | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 086175812 |
Same As/Similar To
HB781 (Same As) 2008-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0654)
Subjects
Administration of Government
Arts and Humanities
Commissions, Boards and Institutions Generally
Southwest Virginia
Arts and Humanities
Commissions, Boards and Institutions Generally
Southwest Virginia
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB653 |