VA SB660 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Office of the Attorney General; Virginia Fraud Against Taxpayers Act; funds recovered. Authorizes the Division of Debt Collection in the Office of the Attorney General to pursue claims and recoveries owed to the Commonwealth under the Fraud Against Taxpayers Act (FATA). Under the bill, the Division is authorized to retain as special revenue up to 30 percent of the funds recovered. The bill excludes investigations, litigation, or recoveries related to matters handled under the authority granted to the Medicaid Fraud Control Unit of the Office of the Attorney General pursuant to the provisions of federal regulations.
Title
Attorney General, Office of; Virginia Fraud Against Taxpayers Act, funds recovered.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2014-03-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-02-28 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2014-02-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-02-27 | House | Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-02-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2014-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Introduced bill reprinted 14101896D |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 14101896D |