VA SB667 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0643)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0643)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing DBHDS to convey a portion of the real property known as the Southwestern Virginia Mental Health Institute to the Mount Rogers Community Services Board. Corrects the legal description of property authorized by the 2013 General Assembly to be conveyed by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services to the Mount Rogers Community Services Board for the purpose of providing services for individuals in need of mental health, developmental, and substance abuse services.
Title
Southwestern Virginia Mental Health Institute; DBHDS to onvey certain real property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0643) | |
2014-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 643 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB667ER) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-03-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-04 | House | Read third time |
2014-03-03 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-27 | House | Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2014-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2014-02-21 | House | Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB667S1 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14104293D-S1 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14104293D-S1 |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 14104178D |
Subjects
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Counties, Cities, and Towns
Real Estate and Real Estate Tax
Smyth County
Southwest Virginia
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Counties, Cities, and Towns
Real Estate and Real Estate Tax
Smyth County
Southwest Virginia