VA SB689 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - Continued to 2025 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - Continued to 2025 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Exemptions to article; cruise ship gaming in the offshore waters of the Commonwealth.
Title
Casino gaming; cruise ship gaming in the offshore waters of the Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2025 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | Senate | Continued to 2025 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24106103D-S1 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 1-N) |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Assigned GL&T sub: Gaming |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Introduced bill reprinted 24105708D |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 24105708D |